NJ A5213 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes child support arrearages collectable anytime by public welfare or other social services board or agency against obligor or obligor's estate based on amount of public assistance provided due to obligor's failure to pay support.
Title
Makes child support arrearages collectable anytime by public welfare or other social services board or agency against obligor or obligor's estate based on amount of public assistance provided due to obligor's failure to pay support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5213 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3815 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3815 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee