NJ A5128 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires State parks, forests, and other natural and historic areas to remain open to public for seven days if emergency is declared due to failure to enact general appropriation law as prescribed by NJ Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires State parks, forests, and other natural and historic areas to remain open to public for seven days if emergency is declared due to failure to enact general appropriation law as prescribed by NJ Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-0-1)
2017-07-13AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S3430 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback