NJ A5072 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2903
Note: Carry Foward to future S1790
Note: Carry Over of previous S787
Note: Carry Foward to future S1790
Note: Carry Over of previous S787
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns law regarding failure to pay wages.
Title
Concerns law regarding failure to pay wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] |
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1396 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for S1396 (SS) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-22-1) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A5072 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A5072 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1396 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A5072
S787 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5072 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1396 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A5072
S787 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee