NJ A5047 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Law Enforcement Addiction Intervention Pilot Program" in Burlington County; appropriates $75,000.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Law Enforcement Addiction Intervention Pilot Program" in Burlington County; appropriates $75,000.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-7-0)
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3931 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback