NJ A4979 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3584 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes immunity relating to COVID-19 spread in planned real estate developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes immunity relating to COVID-19 spread in planned real estate developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblySubstituted by S3584 (1R)
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-06-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
2020-11-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3584 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.142.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback