NJ A4935 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3378 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits health benefits coverage for certain non-medically indicated early elective deliveries under Medicaid program, SHBP, and SEHBP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits health benefits coverage for certain non-medically indicated early elective deliveries under Medicaid program, SHBP, and SEHBP.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted by S3378 (2R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3378 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.87.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback