NJ A4933 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Listening to Mothers Survey Act"; requires DOH to establish survey to evaluate and improve maternity care access and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Listening to Mothers Survey Act"; requires DOH to establish survey to evaluate and improve maternity care access and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3377 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback