NJ A493 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A305
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S293 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S293 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of smokeless tobacco in public schools.
Title
Prohibits use of smokeless tobacco in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S293 (1R) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A305 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey)
S293 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)
S293 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)