NJ A4868 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1623
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Small Business Resiliency Project Loan Program in EDA for certain small businesses implementing certain resiliency projects.
Title
Establishes Small Business Resiliency Project Loan Program in EDA for certain small businesses implementing certain resiliency projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2022-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4868 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3370 (Same As) 2022-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3370 (Same As) 2022-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee