NJ A4861 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Treasury to establish and maintain electronic verification system to verify State employees' eligibility to participate in federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program.
Title
Requires Treasury to establish and maintain electronic verification system to verify State employees' eligibility to participate in federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4230 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee