NJ A4848 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to examine and make recommendations regarding implementation of "Anti-Bullying Bill of Rights Act."
Title
Establishes task force to examine and make recommendations regarding implementation of "Anti-Bullying Bill of Rights Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2575 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2575 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.179.