NJ A4763 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A776
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes amount of certain early withdrawals from qualified retirement plans in determination by Higher Education Student Assistance Authority of applicant's eligibility for and amount of State tuition aid grant.
Title
Excludes amount of certain early withdrawals from qualified retirement plans in determination by Higher Education Student Assistance Authority of applicant's eligibility for and amount of State tuition aid grant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3326 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3326 |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4763 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
S3326 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4763
S3326 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4763