NJ A4732 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3059
Note: Carry Foward to future S3885
Note: Carry Foward to future S3885
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases dedication of certain revenues to "New Jersey Wine Promotion Account."
Title
Increases dedication of certain revenues to "New Jersey Wine Promotion Account."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3509 |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4732 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509
A4732 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509
S3509 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4732 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509
S3509 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate