NJ A4676 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S2515 (SCS/5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes postconsumer recycled content requirements for rigid plastic containers, glass containers, paper and plastic carryout bags, and plastic trash bags; prohibits sale of polystyrene loose fill packaging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes postconsumer recycled content requirements for rigid plastic containers, glass containers, paper and plastic carryout bags, and plastic trash bags; prohibits sale of polystyrene loose fill packaging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10AssemblySubstituted by S2515 (SCS/5R)
2022-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-01-06AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-12-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-11-15AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-09-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2515 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.391.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback