NJ A4663 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2924 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates two-year "Restorative and Transformative Justice for Youths and Communities Pilot Program" in Juvenile Justice Commission; appropriates $4.2 million in FY 2022 and FY 2023.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates two-year "Restorative and Transformative Justice for Youths and Communities Pilot Program" in Juvenile Justice Commission; appropriates $4.2 million in FY 2022 and FY 2023.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblySubstituted by S2924 (1R)
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-05-05AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-09-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2924 (Same As) 2021-08-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.196.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback