NJ A466 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A537
Note: Carry Foward to future S1749
Note: Carry Over of previous A4421
Note: Carry Over of previous A4421
Note: Carry Foward to future S1749
Note: Carry Over of previous A4421
Note: Carry Over of previous A4421
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Holocaust Reparations Tax Exemption Act"; exempts value of certain payments to Holocaust survivors and their eligible descendants from transfer inheritance and estate taxes.
Title
"Holocaust Reparations Tax Exemption Act"; exempts value of certain payments to Holocaust survivors and their eligible descendants from transfer inheritance and estate taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A466 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A466 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A4421 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S2117 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4421 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A466 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A4421 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S2117 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4421 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A466 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/466_I1.HTM |