NJ A4636 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2878 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-11AssemblySubstituted by S2878 (1R)
2015-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-06-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2878 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback