NJ A4613 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "The Democracy Act" to modify various voter registration and voting procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "The Democracy Act" to modify various voter registration and voting procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S50 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S50 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - General Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - General Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-09AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
2015-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-16)
2015-06-29SenateSubstituted for S50
2015-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2015-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (45-31-3)
2015-06-22AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S50 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A4613

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback