NJ A4569 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2834 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2834 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Water Quality Accountability Act"; imposes certain testing, reporting, management, and infrastructure investment requirements on water purveyors.
Title
The "Water Quality Accountability Act"; imposes certain testing, reporting, management, and infrastructure investment requirements on water purveyors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2834 (1R) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2834 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.133.