NJ A455 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1637
Note: Carry Over of previous A619
Note: Carry Over of previous S1254
Note: Carry Over of previous A619
Note: Carry Over of previous S1254
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Director of Division of Taxation to include sales of properties in age-restricted developments by third parties in table of equalized valuations.
Title
Requires Director of Division of Taxation to include sales of properties in age-restricted developments by third parties in table of equalized valuations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A455 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A619 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1450 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A619 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1450 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A455 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/455_I1.HTM |