NJ A4530 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns information on property condition disclosure statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns information on property condition disclosure statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback