NJ A4480 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S628
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to review various aspects of Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Requires DHS to review various aspects of Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4480 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2791 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2791 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading