NJ A448 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A533
Note: Carry Over of previous A3443
Note: Carry Over of previous A3443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association to require criminal history records check for person to serve as official at athletic events sanctioned by association.
Title
Requires New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association to require criminal history records check for person to serve as official at athletic events sanctioned by association.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A448 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3443 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3587 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3443 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3587 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A448 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/448_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A448 |