NJ A445 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1014
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from disclosure as public record personal identifying information provided to government agency for emergency notification purposes.
Title
Exempts from disclosure as public record personal identifying information provided to government agency for emergency notification purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A445 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S601 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S601 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A445 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A0500/445_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A445 |