NJ A4423 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S776
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires governmental affairs agents to disclose on notice of representation form compensation amount received from State or local government entities; requires notice to be posted on Internet site of Election Law Enforcement Commission.
Title
Requires governmental affairs agents to disclose on notice of representation form compensation amount received from State or local government entities; requires notice to be posted on Internet site of Election Law Enforcement Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1404 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1404 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.49.
S776 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S776 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee