NJ A4403 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S2857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S2857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Adjutant General to create informational webpage for Gold Star families.
Title
Requires Adjutant General to create informational webpage for Gold Star families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted by S2857 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2857 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.58.