NJ A4379 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3337

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits municipalities to adopt ordinances to enforce certain landlord code violations as tax liens.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits municipalities to adopt ordinances to enforce certain landlord code violations as tax liens.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-10-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-09-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1151 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3337 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback