NJ A4338 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Prescription Drug Consumer Transparency Act;" requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain information to benefit plan purchasers and to establish toll-free telephone number for certain inquiries.
Title
"Prescription Drug Consumer Transparency Act;" requires pharmacy benefits managers to disclose certain information to benefit plan purchasers and to establish toll-free telephone number for certain inquiries.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3033 (Same As) 2017-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee