NJ A4330 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1083

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Economic Emergency Investment Stabilization Act"; allows EDA to invest in businesses impacted by major economic emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Economic Emergency Investment Stabilization Act"; allows EDA to invest in businesses impacted by major economic emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2021-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (62-10-0)
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-06-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4330 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2680 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback