NJ A4318 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2437
Note: Carry Foward to future S1630
Note: Carry Foward to future S1630
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes grant program for school districts and charter schools to develop dual language immersion programs.
Title
Establishes grant program for school districts and charter schools to develop dual language immersion programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2704 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4318 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2704
A4318 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2704
S2704 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-1-0)
A4318 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2704
S2704 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-1-0)