NJ A431 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1635

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-03-26AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1635 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback