NJ A1635 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A431
Note: Carry Over of previous A1046
Note: Carry Over of previous A1046
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes wiretap orders for investigation of luring or enticing a child, identity theft, stalking and cyber-harassment under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1635 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1046 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2162 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1046 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2162 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee