NJ A4229 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3242
Note: Carry Over of previous A4645
Note: Carry Over of previous A4645
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJEDA to establish loan program to assist beginning farmers in financing capital purchases.
Title
Requires NJEDA to establish loan program to assist beginning farmers in financing capital purchases.
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] | Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Dawn Fantasia [R] | Rep. Andrea Katz [D] |
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1881 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3242 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4645 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3242 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4645 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee