NJ A4219 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows minors 14 years of age or older to authorize organ donation; requires MVC to provide organ donation registration to certain minors.
Title
Allows minors 14 years of age or older to authorize organ donation; requires MVC to provide organ donation registration to certain minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] |
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3282 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3282 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-1) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3282 (1R) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3282 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4219 (1R)