NJ A4187 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1520
Note: Carry Foward to future A434
Note: Carry Foward to future A434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Disqualifies casino license applicant for five-year period if person substantially closed casino property in State; revokes license; reinstates license eligibility under certain circumstances.*
Title
Disqualifies casino license applicant for five-year period if person substantially closed casino property in State; revokes license; reinstates license eligibility under certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S2575 (1R) |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4187 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
A4187 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
S2575 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4187 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2575 (1R)
S2575 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate