NJ A4183 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2723 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2723 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes STEM Loan Redemption Program.
Title
Establishes STEM Loan Redemption Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2723 (1R) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2723 (Same As) 2018-12-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.142.