NJ A4173 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank's enabling act.
Title
Makes various changes to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank's enabling act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2645 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2645 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.75.