NJ A4170 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2747 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2747 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits PANYNJ from imposing cargo facility charge in certain instances.
Title
Prohibits PANYNJ from imposing cargo facility charge in certain instances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2747 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2747 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.216.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4170 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4170_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4170_R1.HTM |