NJ A4163 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs State Lottery Commission to permit lottery player to submit and validate lottery claimsof $600 or more via Internet, mobile application, or other electronic means.
Title
Directs State Lottery Commission to permit lottery player to submit and validate lottery claimsof $600 or more via Internet, mobile application, or other electronic means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4163 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee