NJ A415 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Substituted by S1266 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes permanent sterile syringe access program.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes permanent sterile syringe access program.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-30AssemblySubstituted by S1266 (2R)
2016-06-27AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mukherji)
2016-06-27AssemblyReconsidered Vote (Eustace) (70-5-0)
2016-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (61-14-1)
2016-06-23AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-06-23AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1725 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1266 (Same As) 2016-08-31 - Approved P.L.2016, c.36.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback