NJ A4101 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires social media companies to establish toll-free telephone number for NJ account holders to report fraudulent account actions.
Title
Requires social media companies to establish toll-free telephone number for NJ account holders to report fraudulent account actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchelle Drulis [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. William Sampson [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2025-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-15-1) |
2025-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2025-02-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3017 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee