NJ A4087 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A674

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2521 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires reporting of inmate abuse by employees of State correctional facilities and establishes reporting and investigation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires reporting of inmate abuse by employees of State correctional facilities and establishes reporting and investigation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S2521 (2R)
2020-01-13AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
2018-06-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4087 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2521 (2R)
S2521 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.408.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback