NJ A4062 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits reimbursement of COBRA health benefit costs of survivors of certain deceased public safety employees; appropriates $750,000.**
Title
Permits reimbursement of COBRA health benefit costs of survivors of certain deceased public safety employees; appropriates $750,000.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4062 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S2851 (Same As) 2015-05-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2851 (Same As) 2015-05-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee