NJ A4043 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.
Title
Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S2773 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2773 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.48.