NJ A4040 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires training for law enforcement officers and assistant county prosecutors concerning handling of domestic violence cases.
Title
Requires training for law enforcement officers and assistant county prosecutors concerning handling of domestic violence cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4040 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2544 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2546 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2544 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2546 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee