NJ A4037 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization of special occasion events at wineries on preserved farmland; implements reporting requirement.
Title
Extends authorization of special occasion events at wineries on preserved farmland; implements reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |