NJ A3943 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises statutes concerning incorporation and governance of the Protestant Episcopal Church to remove gender-specific references.
Title
Revises statutes concerning incorporation and governance of the Protestant Episcopal Church to remove gender-specific references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-1-7) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Barnes) |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |