NJ A3935 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5337

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates civil service preference for peacetime veterans.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates civil service preference for peacetime veterans.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-05-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2375 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5337 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback