NJ A392 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5256

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain physical therapists to perform dry needling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain physical therapists to perform dry needling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5256 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S431 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback