NJ A3911 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A542
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice services.*
Title
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice services.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-3) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3911 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2931 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2931 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee